There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

FIRST State and Local Law Enforcement Act
Federal Information Resource to Strengthen Ties with State and Local Law Enforcement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

FIRST State and Local Law Enforcement Act
Federal Information Resource to Strengthen Ties with State and Local Law Enforcement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require an annual report on the Office for State and Local Law Enforcement.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/12/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7245)
05/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
09/13/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/12/2017-1:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2017-1:11pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7245)
09/12/2017-1:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2442.
09/12/2017-1:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7245-7246)
09/12/2017-1:05pmHouseMr. Hurd moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/18/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/18/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence
05/17/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/16/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/16/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/16/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security05/16/2017 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence05/17/2017 Referred to
05/18/2017 Markup by
House Judiciary05/16/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations05/16/2017 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/13/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2442. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/12/2017)

Federal Information Resource to Strengthen Ties with State and Local Law Enforcement Act of 2017 or the FIRST State and Local Law Enforcement Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security's Office for State and Local Law Enforcement to report annually on its activities.