There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Homeland Security Classified Facility Inventory Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Homeland Security Classified Facility Inventory Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require an inventory of all facilities certified by the Department of Homeland Security to host infrastructure or systems classified above the Secret level, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/12/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7246)
05/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
09/13/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/12/2017-1:19pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2017-1:19pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7246)
09/12/2017-1:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2443.
09/12/2017-1:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7246-7247)
09/12/2017-1:11pmHouseMr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/18/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/18/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence
05/17/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
05/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/16/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security05/16/2017 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence05/17/2017 Referred to
05/18/2017 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/13/2017 Referred to

As of 07/16/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2443 - Department of Homeland Security Classified Facility Inventory Act.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2443. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/12/2017)

Department of Homeland Security Classified Facility Inventory Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) maintain an inventory of DHS facilities that DHS certifies to house classified infrastructure or systems at the secret level and above; (2) update such inventory on a regular basis; and (3) share part or all of such inventory with DHS personnel who have been granted the appropriate security clearance, non-federal governmental personnel who have been granted a Top Secret security clearance, and other personnel as deemed appropriate by DHS. The inventory may include the location, attributes, operating entities, and date of establishment of such facilities.