There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Homeland Security Data Framework Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Homeland Security Data Framework Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Homeland Security to establish a data framework to provide access for appropriate personnel to law enforcement and other information of the Department, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/12/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7243)
05/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
09/13/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/12/2017-1:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2017-1:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7243)
09/12/2017-12:59pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2454.
09/12/2017-12:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7243-7245)
09/12/2017-12:59pmHouseMr. Hurd moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/18/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/18/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence
05/17/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
05/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/16/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security05/16/2017 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence05/17/2017 Referred to
05/18/2017 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/13/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2454. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/12/2017)

Department of Homeland Security Data Framework Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) develop a data framework to integrate existing DHS datasets and systems for access by authorized personnel in a manner consistent with relevant legal authorities and privacy, civil rights, and civil liberties policies and protections; (2) ensure that all information of a DHS office or component that falls within the scope of the information sharing environment, and any information or intelligence relevant to priority mission needs and capability requirements of the homeland security enterprise, is included; and (3) ensure that the framework is accessible to DHS employees who have an appropriate security clearance, who are assigned to perform a function that requires access, and who are trained in applicable standards for safeguarding and using such information.

DHS shall: (1) issue guidance for DHS employees authorized to access and contribute to the framework that enforces a duty to share between DHS offices and components for mission needs; and (2) promulgate data standards and instruct DHS components to make available information through the framework in a machine-readable format.

DHS may exclude information that could:

  • jeopardize the protection of sources, methods, or activities;
  • compromise a criminal or national security investigation;
  • be inconsistent with the other federal laws or regulations; or
  • be duplicative or not serve an operational purpose.

DHS shall incorporate into such framework systems capabilities for auditing and ensuring the security of information. Such capabilities shall include: (1) mechanisms for identifying insider threats and security risks; and (2) safeguards for privacy, civil rights, and civil liberties.

DHS shall ensure that, by two years after this bill's enactment, the framework has the ability to include appropriate information in existence within the department to meet its critical mission operations.