There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

J. Bennett Johnston Waterway Hydropower Extension Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

J. Bennett Johnston Waterway Hydropower Extension Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

J. Bennett Johnston Waterway Hydropower Extension Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the deadline for commencement of construction of certain hydroelectric projects.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/12/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 1 (Roll no. 301).(text: CR H4830)
06/12/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-176.
05/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/28/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-505.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
06/13/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
06/12/2017-7:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/12/2017-7:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 1 (Roll no. 301). (text: CR H4830)
06/12/2017-6:53pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4835)
06/12/2017-4:26pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/12/2017-4:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2457.
06/12/2017-4:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4830-4831)
06/12/2017-4:22pmHouseMr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/12/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 120.
06/12/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-176.
06/07/2017HouseSubcommittee on Energy Discharged.
06/07/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/07/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/19/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce05/16/2017 Referred to
06/07/2017 Markup by
06/12/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-176
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy05/19/2017 Referred to
06/07/2017 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/13/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power02/28/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2457. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/12/2017)

J. Bennett Johnston Waterway Hydropower Extension Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission (FERC), upon request, to extend by six years the time period during which construction must commence on the Red River Lock and Dam No. 3, 4, and 5 Hydroelectric Projects located on the Red River in Louisiana.

The licensee is not required to pay an annual charge for administrative expenses until construction commences.

FERC may reinstate the construction license if it is expired.