There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Homeland Threat Assessment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Homeland Threat Assessment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require an annual homeland threat assessment, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/12/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7237-7238)
05/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/13/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
09/12/2017-12:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2017-12:45pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7237-7238)
09/12/2017-12:38pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2470.
09/12/2017-12:38pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7237-7241)
09/12/2017-12:38pmHouseMr. Gallagher moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/18/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/18/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence
05/17/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
05/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
05/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/16/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security05/16/2017 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence05/17/2017 Referred to
05/18/2017 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs09/13/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2470. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/12/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Homeland Threat Assessment Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security's Office of Intelligence and Analysis to assess the terrorist threat to the homeland for each of the next five fiscal years.

Each assessment shall include:

  • empirical data assessing terrorist activities and incidents over time in the United States;
  • an evaluation of current and future terrorist tactics;
  • an assessment of criminal activity suspected of financing terrorist activity;
  • detailed information on all individuals denied entry to or removed from the United States as a result of material support provided to a foreign terrorist organization;
  • the efficacy and spread of foreign terrorist organization propaganda, messaging, or recruitment;
  • an assessment of threats, including cyber threats, to the homeland, including to critical infrastructure and federal civilian networks;
  • an assessment of terrorism and criminal threats posed by individuals and organized groups seeking to unlawfully enter the United States; and
  • an assessment of threats to the transportation sector.