Text: H.R.2482 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/17/2017)


115th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 2482


To extend temporarily the Federal Perkins Loan program, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

May 17, 2017

Ms. Stefanik (for herself, Mr. Pocan, Mr. Duncan of Tennessee, Ms. Slaughter, Ms. Ros-Lehtinen, and Mr. DeSaulnier) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce


A BILL

To extend temporarily the Federal Perkins Loan program, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Federal Perkins Loan Program Extension Act of 2017”.

SEC. 2. Extension of Federal Perkins loan program.

(a) Authority To make loans.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—Section 461(b) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. 1087aa(b)) is amended—

(A) by striking “September 30, 2017” each place it appears and inserting “September 30, 2019”; and

(B) in paragraph (1)(C)—

(i) by striking “September 30, 2016” and inserting “September 30, 2018”; and

(ii) by striking “October 1, 2015” and inserting “October 1, 2017”.

(2) RULE OF CONSTRUCTION.—Notwithstanding the amendments made under paragraph (1) of this subsection, an eligible graduate borrower who received a disbursement of a loan under part E of title IV of the Higher Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. 1087aa et seq.) after June 30, 2018, and before October 1, 2018, for the 2018–2019 award year, may receive a subsequent disbursement of such loan by June 30, 2019, for which the borrower received an initial disbursement after June 30, 2018, and before October 1, 2018.

(b) Distribution of assets from student loan funds.—Section 466 of the Higher Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. 1087ff) is amended—

(1) by striking “October 1, 2017” each place it appears and inserting “October 1, 2019”; and

(2) by striking “September 30, 2017” each place it appears and inserting “September 30, 2019”.

(c) Additional extensions not permitted.—Section 422 of the General Education Provisions Act (20 U.S.C. 1226a) shall not apply to further extend the duration of the authority under paragraph (1) of section 461(b) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. 1087aa(b)), as amended by subsection (a)(1) of this section, beyond September 30, 2019, on the basis of the extension under such subsection.