Text: H.R.2482 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/17/2017)

 
[Congressional Bills 115th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[H.R. 2482 Introduced in House (IH)]

<DOC>






115th CONGRESS
  1st Session
                                H. R. 2482

 To extend temporarily the Federal Perkins Loan program, and for other 
                               purposes.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                              May 17, 2017

  Ms. Stefanik (for herself, Mr. Pocan, Mr. Duncan of Tennessee, Ms. 
    Slaughter, Ms. Ros-Lehtinen, and Mr. DeSaulnier) introduced the 
 following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Education and 
                             the Workforce

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
 To extend temporarily the Federal Perkins Loan program, and for other 
                               purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Federal Perkins Loan Program 
Extension Act of 2017''.

SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF FEDERAL PERKINS LOAN PROGRAM.

    (a) Authority To Make Loans.--
            (1) In general.--Section 461(b) of the Higher Education Act 
        of 1965 (20 U.S.C. 1087aa(b)) is amended--
                    (A) by striking ``September 30, 2017'' each place 
                it appears and inserting ``September 30, 2019''; and
                    (B) in paragraph (1)(C)--
                            (i) by striking ``September 30, 2016'' and 
                        inserting ``September 30, 2018''; and
                            (ii) by striking ``October 1, 2015'' and 
                        inserting ``October 1, 2017''.
            (2) Rule of construction.--Notwithstanding the amendments 
        made under paragraph (1) of this subsection, an eligible 
        graduate borrower who received a disbursement of a loan under 
        part E of title IV of the Higher Education Act of 1965 (20 
        U.S.C. 1087aa et seq.) after June 30, 2018, and before October 
        1, 2018, for the 2018-2019 award year, may receive a subsequent 
        disbursement of such loan by June 30, 2019, for which the 
        borrower received an initial disbursement after June 30, 2018, 
        and before October 1, 2018.
    (b) Distribution of Assets From Student Loan Funds.--Section 466 of 
the Higher Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. 1087ff) is amended--
            (1) by striking ``October 1, 2017'' each place it appears 
        and inserting ``October 1, 2019''; and
            (2) by striking ``September 30, 2017'' each place it 
        appears and inserting ``September 30, 2019''.
    (c) Additional Extensions Not Permitted.--Section 422 of the 
General Education Provisions Act (20 U.S.C. 1226a) shall not apply to 
further extend the duration of the authority under paragraph (1) of 
section 461(b) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 (20 U.S.C. 
1087aa(b)), as amended by subsection (a)(1) of this section, beyond 
September 30, 2019, on the basis of the extension under such 
subsection.
                                 <all>