There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Puerto Rico Small Business Assistance Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for small business concerns located in Puerto Rico, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/17/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
05/17/2017Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/17/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 06/07/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/07/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/07/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/07/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 06/07/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/07/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/07/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/07/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/07/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 06/07/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/07/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/07/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/07/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/07/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/07/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/07/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/07/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/07/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/07/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/07/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/07/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/07/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/07/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/07/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/07/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/07/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 06/07/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/07/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/07/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/07/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/07/2017
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/19/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 08/18/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/14/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business05/17/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2488. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/17/2017)

Puerto Rico Small Business Assistance Act of 2017

This bill amends the Small Business Act regarding small businesses that have their principal office in Puerto Rico, including to temporarily:

  • increase the total amount of loans outstanding and committed to any microloan intermediary if at least 20% of the intermediary's loans are made to such businesses;
  • waive the Small Business Administration (SBA) Microloan Program's limit on an intermediary's spending on technical assistance for prospective borrowers if 25% of the intermediary's loans are made to these businesses;
  • reduce or eliminate SBA fees on certain loans to such businesses; and
  • give federal contract preference to such businesses, transfer specified technology or surplus property to them, and provide subcontracting incentives for their protege firms.

The SBA shall establish: (1) a Veteran Business Outreach Center in Puerto Rico, and (2) a temporary Federal and State Technology (FAST) grant program to provide assistance to Puerto Rico businesses.

The SBA district office in Puerto Rico must temporarily report annually to Congress and the SBA on its activities in Puerto Rico.