There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Respect Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose sanctions with respect to foreign persons responsible for gross violations of internationally recognized human rights against lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender (LGBT) individuals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/17/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
06/27/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/17/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2017Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 05/17/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/17/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 05/17/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/17/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/23/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/23/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 05/23/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 06/06/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 06/06/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/06/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/15/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 07/25/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 11/30/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/11/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 03/26/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/10/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 04/10/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/10/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/15/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/15/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/15/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/15/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/15/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 06/08/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/08/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 11/14/2018
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 12/19/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs05/17/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations06/27/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary05/17/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2491. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/17/2017)

Global Respect Act

This bill directs the President to submit to Congress, biannually, a list of each foreign person that the President determines is responsible for or complicit in, or who acted as an agent for a foreign person in a mater relating to, torture, cruel treatment, prolonged detention, or other gross violations of internationally recognized human rights committed against an individual in a foreign country based on actual or perceived sexual orientation or gender identity.

A listed person: (1) may be removed from the list under specified conditions; (2) is ineligible to enter or be admitted to the United States, or (3) if in the United States, shall have his or her visa revoked and be removed.

The Department of State and the Department of Homeland Security may waive such prohibition if such waiver is in U.S. national security interests or is necessary for compliance with the Agreement between the United Nations (U.N.) and the United States regarding the U.N. Headquarters. Congressional notification is required prior to any such waiver.

The Assistant Secretary for Democracy, Human Rights and Labor shall designate a senior officer or officers to track violence, criminalization, and restrictions on fundamental freedoms in foreign countries based on actual or perceived sexual orientation or gender identity.

The Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 is amended to require the annual country reports on human rights practices to include information on sexual orientation or gender identity violence or restrictions.