There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Online Booking Scams Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect consumers from deceptive practices with respect to online booking of hotel reservations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/17/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
05/19/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Digital Commerce and Consumer Protection.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/17/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/17/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/17/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/19/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/19/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/19/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/19/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/19/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/02/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 06/02/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 06/08/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 06/08/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 06/08/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/08/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/08/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/08/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 06/08/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/15/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 06/15/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/15/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/15/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 06/15/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 07/12/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/12/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/12/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/27/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/01/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 11/01/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 12/06/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/06/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 04/26/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/06/2018
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 06/15/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/19/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 06/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/17/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade05/19/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2495. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/17/2017)

Stop Online Booking Scams Act of 2017

This bill prohibits third-party online hotel reservation sellers from charging a consumer's credit card or financial accounts in an Internet transaction for a hotel unless they disclose: (1) a description of the offered good or service, the cost, and other material terms before the conclusion of the transaction; (2) that the third-party seller is not affiliated with the hotel owner or an entity that provides the hotel services or accommodations; (3) that the third-party seller is not an exhibition organizer, a meeting planner, or the official housing bureau for an event at the hotel; and (4) the brand identity of the third party online or over the phone.

The bill provides authority to the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) and states to enforce against violations.

The bill also expresses the sense of Congress that the FTC should revise its website to make it easier for consumers and businesses to report complaints of deceptive practices with respect to online booking of hotel reservations.