There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

South Carolina Peanut Parity Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

South Carolina Peanut Parity Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

South Carolina Peanut Parity Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Farm Security and Rural Investment Act of 2002 to include South Carolina as a part of the Virginia/Carolina peanut producing region for purposes of appointment to the Peanut Standards Board.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/31/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 1 (Roll no. 591).(text: CR H8284)
10/19/2017Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 115-352.
05/18/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
11/01/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
10/31/2017-6:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/31/2017-6:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 1 (Roll no. 591). (text: CR H8284)
10/31/2017-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8285-8286)
10/31/2017-5:23pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/31/2017-5:19pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2521.
10/31/2017-5:19pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8284-8285)
10/31/2017-5:19pmHouseMr. Crawford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/19/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 256.
10/19/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 115-352.
10/04/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
10/04/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/08/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/18/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
05/18/2017HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E662)
05/18/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 05/18/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 05/18/2017
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/18/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 05/18/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1]* 05/18/2017
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 09/26/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture05/18/2017 Referred to
10/04/2017 Markup by
10/19/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-352
House Agriculture Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management06/08/2017 Referred to
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry11/01/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2521. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/31/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

South Carolina Peanut Parity Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Farm Security and Rural Investment Act of 2002 to add South Carolina to the Virginia/Carolina peanut producing region for the purpose of appointing members of the Peanut Standards Board.

(Under current law, the region includes Virginia and North Carolina. The board advises the Department of Agriculture regarding the establishment of quality and handling standards for domestically produced and imported peanuts.)