There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Expanded Trucking Opportunities Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Expanded Trucking Opportunities Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Expanded Trucking Opportunities Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expand the Department of Veterans Affairs medical professionals who may qualify to perform physical examinations on eligible veterans and issue medical certificates required for operation of a commercial motor vehicle, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/26/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 323).(text: CR H5143)
06/23/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-190.
05/18/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/27/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
06/26/2017-6:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/26/2017-6:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 323). (text: CR H5143)
06/26/2017-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5164-5165)
06/26/2017-5:11pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/26/2017-5:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2547.
06/26/2017-5:00pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5143-5144)
06/26/2017-5:00pmHouseMr. Graves (MO) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/23/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 129.
06/23/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-190.
05/24/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/24/2017HouseSubcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged.
05/19/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/18/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
05/18/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/18/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 05/23/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/18/2017 Referred to
06/23/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-190
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit05/19/2017 Referred to
05/24/2017 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/27/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2547. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/26/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on June 23, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Veterans Expanded Trucking Opportunities Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Fast Act to require the medical professional who may perform a medical examination and provide a medical certificate for purposes of compliance with requirements for operation of a commercial motor vehicle to be a "qualified examiner" who:

  • is employed in the Department of Veterans Affairs as an advanced practice nurse, doctor of chiropractic, doctor of medicine, doctor of osteopathy, physician assistant, or other medical professional; and
  • is licensed, certified, or registered in a state to perform physical examinations.