There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Promoting Women in Entrepreneurship Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Promoting Women in Entrepreneurship Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Promoting Women in Entrepreneurship Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Promoting Women in Entrepreneurship Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the National Science Foundation to support entrepreneurial programs for women.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
02/28/2017Became Public Law No: 115-6. (TXT | PDF)
02/28/2017Signed by President.
02/16/2017Presented to President.
02/14/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1163)
02/01/2017Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. Without written report.
01/10/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H273)
01/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
02/28/2017Became Public Law No: 115-6. (TXT | PDF)
02/28/2017Signed by President.
02/16/2017HousePresented to President.
02/15/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/14/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1163)
02/01/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 5.
02/01/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
01/24/2017SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation
01/11/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
01/10/2017-4:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/10/2017-4:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H273)
01/10/2017-4:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 255.
01/10/2017-4:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H273-275)
01/10/2017-4:03pmHouseMrs. Comstock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
01/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10]* 01/04/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/04/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/04/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/09/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 01/09/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/09/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/09/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/09/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/09/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 01/09/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 01/09/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/09/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/09/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/09/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/09/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/09/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 01/09/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/09/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/09/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 01/09/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 01/09/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/09/2017
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large] 01/09/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 01/09/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/09/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/09/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/09/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/09/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 01/09/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 01/09/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/09/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/09/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 01/09/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/09/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 01/09/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 01/09/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 01/09/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 01/09/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/09/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 01/10/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/10/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/10/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/10/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/10/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science, Space, and Technology01/04/2017 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/11/2017 Referred to
01/24/2017 Markup by
02/01/2017 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.255. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-6 (02/28/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

Promoting Women in Entrepreneurship Act

(Sec. 3) This bill amends the Science and Engineering Equal Opportunities Act to authorize the National Science Foundation to encourage its entrepreneurial programs to recruit and support women to extend their focus beyond the laboratory and into the commercial world.