There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Verify First Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Verify First Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Verify First Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to require the provision of social security numbers as a condition of receiving the health insurance premium tax credit.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
06/13/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 238 - 184 (Roll no. 306).(text: CR H4875)
06/02/2017Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
06/02/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-161, Part I.
05/22/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
06/14/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
06/13/2017-4:11pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/13/2017-4:11pmHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 238 - 184 (Roll no. 306). (text: CR H4875)
06/13/2017-4:04pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 193 - 231 (Roll no. 305). (text: CR H4883)
06/13/2017-3:38pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4896-4898)
06/13/2017-2:36pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Sanchez motion to recommit with instructions, Chair put the question on adoption of the motion to recommit and by voice vote announced that the noes had prevailed. Ms. Sanchez demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the motion to recommit with instructions until later in the later legislative day.
06/13/2017-2:36pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H4883)
06/13/2017-2:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Sanchez motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to report the same back to the House forthwith with an amendment to add an exemption to the underlying bill for newborn children who are less than one year of age.
06/13/2017-2:29pmHouseMs. Sanchez moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Ways and Means. (text: CR H4883)
06/13/2017-1:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2581.
06/13/2017-1:37pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 2581 and S. 1094, with 1 hour of general debate for each bill. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except a motion to recommit with or without instructions on H.R. 2581, and a motion to commit on S. 1094. Both measures will be considered read and are closed to amendments.
06/13/2017-1:37pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 378. (consideration: CR H4875-4883)
06/12/2017-7:15pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 378 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2581 and S. 1094. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2581 and S. 1094, with 1 hour of general debate for each bill. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except a motion to recommit with or without instructions on H.R. 2581, and a motion to commit on S. 1094. Both measures will be considered read and are closed to amendments.
06/02/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 108.
06/02/2017HouseCommittee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
06/02/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-161, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/26/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/22/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/22/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/22/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/22/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/22/2017 Referred to
06/02/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-161
House Energy and Commerce05/22/2017 Referred to
06/02/2017 Discharged from
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/26/2017 Referred to
Senate Finance06/14/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2581. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/13/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on June 2, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Verify First Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to prohibit advance payments of the premium assistance tax credit from being made to an individual unless the Department of the Treasury has received confirmation from the Department of Health and Human Services that the Social Security Administration or the Department of Homeland Security has verified the individual's status as a citizen or national of the United States or an alien lawfully present in the United States.

The verification process must include the appropriate use of information related to citizenship or immigration status, such as Social Security numbers (but not individual taxpayer identification numbers).

The bill also amends the Public Health Service Act and the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to permit adjustments to certain health insurance coverage dates for an individual whose eligibility for advance payments is delayed due to the verification requirements.

The bill is contingent on the enactment of the American Health Care Act of 2017 (AHCA). If the AHCA is enacted, the bill applies to: (1) the existing tax credit after December 31, 2017; and (2) the tax credit, as modified by the AHCA, after December 31, 2019.