There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Park Service Legacy Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 54, United States Code, to establish, fund, and provide for the use of amounts in a National Park Service Legacy Restoration Fund to address the maintenance backlog of the National Park Service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/22/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/20/2018Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
06/07/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/23/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/22/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/22/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (83)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 05/22/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/20/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/20/2017
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/20/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 06/20/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/20/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 06/20/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/20/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/26/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 06/26/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 06/26/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/26/2017
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/11/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/11/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 07/14/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/14/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/20/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/20/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 07/24/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 07/24/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 08/04/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 08/04/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 08/04/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 08/04/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/02/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/02/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/02/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 10/02/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/12/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/12/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/12/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/12/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 10/25/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/25/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 10/25/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 10/25/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/01/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/01/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 11/07/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/07/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 11/10/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/10/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 11/28/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/28/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 11/28/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/28/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/29/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 11/29/2017
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/14/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/14/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 01/16/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/16/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 02/02/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 02/02/2018
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/26/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/26/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 03/14/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/14/2018
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/19/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/19/2018
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 03/22/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 03/22/2018
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/26/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 03/26/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 04/11/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/11/2018
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/12/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/12/2018
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/17/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/17/2018
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/17/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/17/2018
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/23/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/23/2018
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 06/20/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/20/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/10/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/10/2018
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/16/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 07/16/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/22/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/07/2017 Referred to
03/20/2018 Hearings by
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/22/2017 Referred to
House Transportation Subcommittee on Highways and Transit05/23/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2584. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/22/2017)

National Park Service Legacy Act of 2017

This bill: (1) establishes the National Park Service Legacy Restoration Fund, and (2) requires specified amounts of federal mineral revenues that are not otherwise credited, covered, or deposited pursuant to federal law to be deposited into such fund each fiscal year through FY2047.

Amounts in the fund shall be used for meeting high-priority deferred maintenance needs of the National Park Service (NPS) as follows:

  • 20% shall be allocated to transportation-related projects that may be eligible for funding made available to the NPS through the federal lands transportation program or any similar federal land highway program administered by the Department of Transportation; and
  • 80% shall be allocated for the repair and rehabilitation of assets for certain projects that are not eligible for funding under such programs, including historic assets, nonhistoric assets related to visitor access, health and safety, and recreation, and visitor facilities, water and utility systems, and employee housing.

No fund amounts may be used by the NPS to acquire land or to supplant discretionary funding made available for annually recurring facility operations and maintenance needs.

As part of its annual budget submission, the NPS shall submit a prioritized list of deferred maintenance projects proposed to be funded by such fund during the fiscal year.