There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business Payment for Performance Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to provide interim partial payment to small business contractors that request an equitable adjustment due to a change in the terms of a construction contract, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/23/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
06/15/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Small Business
06/15/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
05/23/2017Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/06/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 06/20/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business05/23/2017 Referred to
06/15/2017 Markup by

As of 07/23/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2594 - Small Business Payment for Performance Act of 2017.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2594. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/23/2017)

Small Business Payment for Performance Act of 2017

This bill amends the Small Business Act to allow a small business performing a construction contract awarded by a federal agency to submit a request for an equitable adjustment to the agency's contracting officer if such officer directs a change in the terms of the contract performance without the agreement of the small business.

The agency must provide to the small business an interim partial payment of at least 50% of the estimated amount required to cover additional costs resulting from such change. Such small business shall pay to a first tier subcontractor or supplier the portion of such payment that is attributable to the increased costs of performance incurred by such subcontractor or supplier due to such change.