There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Gun Violence Restraining Order Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide family members of an individual who they fear is a danger to himself, herself, or others new tools to prevent gun violence.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/23/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
05/23/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/23/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4429)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (144)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 05/23/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/08/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 06/08/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/08/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/26/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/27/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/27/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/05/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/05/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/05/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 09/25/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/03/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 10/03/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/03/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/27/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/27/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 10/27/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 10/27/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 10/27/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 10/27/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 10/27/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 10/27/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/27/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/27/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/27/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 10/27/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/27/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/27/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/27/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 10/27/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/27/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/27/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 10/27/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 10/27/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 10/27/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 11/08/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/08/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/28/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/28/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 11/30/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 11/30/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 11/30/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 11/30/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 11/30/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 11/30/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/30/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 11/30/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/30/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/30/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/20/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/20/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/20/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 02/20/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/20/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/20/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/20/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 02/20/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/20/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/20/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 02/27/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 02/27/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/27/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/27/2018
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 02/27/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/27/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/27/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/27/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/27/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/27/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/27/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/27/2018
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/27/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/27/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/27/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 02/27/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/27/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/27/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/27/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 02/27/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/27/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/27/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/27/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 02/27/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 03/01/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/01/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/01/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 03/01/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/07/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 03/07/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/07/2018
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 03/07/2018
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 03/08/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 03/09/2018
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/13/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 03/15/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/15/2018
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/15/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/02/2018
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/02/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/16/2018
Del. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/07/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/07/2018
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 05/07/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 05/07/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/08/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 05/09/2018
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 05/22/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/22/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/23/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/23/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/24/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 06/05/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/05/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/05/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/05/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/05/2018
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/05/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/05/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/08/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/08/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/08/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/14/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/20/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/20/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 06/22/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 06/25/2018
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14] 06/25/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/25/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/25/2018
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/25/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/25/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/26/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/26/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/27/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/27/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/06/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/18/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 08/21/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/04/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 09/04/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/23/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 10/26/2018
Rep. Morelle, Joseph D. [D-NY-25] 12/12/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary05/23/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations05/23/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2598. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/23/2017)

Gun Violence Restraining Order Act of 2017

This bill amends the federal criminal code to prohibit the sale, transfer to, receipt of, or possession of a firearm by a person who is subject to a gun violence prevention order. A gun violence prevention order is a court order that prohibits an individual from owning, purchasing, possessing, or receiving a firearm.

The bill authorizes the Department of Justice's Office of Community Oriented Policing Services to make grants to states that have in effect legislation that: (1) authorizes a family member, or a law enforcement officer, to apply for a gun violence prevention order against an individual who may pose a significant risk to themselves or others; (2) authorizes a law enforcement officer to temporarily seize firearms from that individual, subject to a warrant; and (3) requires law enforcement agencies to comply with certain requirements.