There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

SAVES Act
Saving America's Vulnerable and Endangered Species Act

Short Titles as Introduced

SAVES Act
Saving America's Endangered Species Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to provide that nonnative species in the United States shall not be treated as endangered species or threatened species for purposes of that Act.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/15/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-562.
05/23/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
02/15/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 423.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-562.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/04/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 16.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
10/04/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/19/2017Committee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/23/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/23/2017 Referred to
07/19/2017 Hearings by
10/04/2017 Markup by
02/15/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-562

As of 08/21/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2603 - SAVES Act.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2603. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (02/15/2018)

Saving America's Vulnerable and Endangered Species Act or the SAVES Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to limit the scope of the Act to native species. Species that are not native to the United States may not be treated or listed as endangered or threatened species.