There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modify the boundary of the Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/12/2018Became Public Law No: 115-117. (TXT | PDF)
01/12/2018Signed by President.
01/02/2018Presented to President.
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S8267-8269)
09/12/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 0 (Roll no. 485).(text: CR H7251)
09/05/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-290.
05/23/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
01/12/2018Became Public Law No: 115-117. (TXT | PDF)
01/12/2018Signed by President.
01/02/2018HousePresented to President.
12/22/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269)
09/13/2017SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/12/2017-6:53pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2017-6:53pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 0 (Roll no. 485). (text: CR H7251)
09/12/2017-6:25pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7287)
09/12/2017-2:11pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/12/2017-1:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2611.
09/12/2017-1:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7251-7253)
09/12/2017-1:50pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/05/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 209.
09/05/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-290.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/26/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/26/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/07/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/23/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/23/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/23/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/21/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/21/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/23/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
09/05/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-290
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/07/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2611. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-117 (01/12/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site Boundary Modification Act

(Sec. 2) This bill adjusts the boundary of the Little Rock Central High School National Historic Site in Arkansas to include the 7 residences on South Park Street in Little Rock, which consist of 1.47 acres of specified land.

The Department of the Interior may enter into separate cooperative agreements with the owners of such residences to mark, interpret, improve, restore, and provide technical assistance for the preservation and interpretation of their properties.

Such an agreement must include a provision specifying that no changes or alterations shall be made to the exterior of the properties except by mutual agreement.