There are 8 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (8)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act

Other Short Titles

Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the exchange of certain land located in Gulf Islands National Seashore, Jackson County, Mississippi, between the National Park Service and the Veterans of Foreign Wars, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
11/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-279. (TXT | PDF)
11/20/2018Signed by President.
11/14/2018Presented to President.
11/13/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 375 - 1 (Roll no. 417).(text: CR H9484-9485)
10/11/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S6875-6876; text: CR S6875-6876)
04/11/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-228.
11/28/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9442)
09/11/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-302.
05/23/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-279. (TXT | PDF)
11/20/2018Signed by President.
11/14/2018HousePresented to President.
11/13/2018-7:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2018-7:26pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 375 - 1 (Roll no. 417). (text: CR H9484-9485)
11/13/2018-4:40pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/13/2018-4:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 2615.
11/13/2018-4:36pmHouseMr. Gosar moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9484-9485, H9501)
10/12/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/11/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6875-6876; text: CR S6875-6876)
04/11/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 376.
04/11/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-228.
03/08/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
02/14/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-504.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
11/29/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
11/28/2017-4:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/28/2017-4:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9442)
11/28/2017-4:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2615.
11/28/2017-4:35pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9442-9443)
11/28/2017-4:35pmHouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/11/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 216.
09/11/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-302.
07/26/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/26/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/07/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/23/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/23/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources05/23/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
09/11/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-302
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/07/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/29/2017 Referred to
03/08/2018 Markup by
04/11/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-228
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks02/14/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2615. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-279 (11/20/2018)

Gulf Islands National Seashore Land Exchange Act

(Sec. 3) This bill authorizes the National Park Service (NPS) to convey approximately 1.542 acres of federal land located within the Gulf Islands National Seashore in Jackson County, Mississippi, to the Veterans of Foreign Wars Post 5699 in exchange for approximately 2.161 acres located in the county (the nonfederal land).

The values of the parcels to be exchanged shall be determined by an independent appraiser in accordance with nationally recognized appraisal standards. If the values of such parcels are not equal, their values shall be equalized through a cash payment or adjustments to their acreage.

The NPS shall require the post to pay or reimburse the costs incurred by the NPS to carry out such exchange.

The bill subjects the exchange of the federal and nonfederal lands to valid existing rights.

Any nonfederal land acquired by the United States under this bill shall be administered as part of the Gulf Islands National Seashore.