There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

La Paz County Land Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

La Paz County Land Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Introduced

La Paz County Land Conveyance Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

La Paz County Land Conveyance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to convey certain land to La Paz County, Arizona, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
11/14/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 115-365.
07/23/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6621-6622)
01/29/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-536.
05/24/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
11/14/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 652.
11/14/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with amendments. With written report No. 115-365.
10/02/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
07/24/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/23/2018-4:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2018-4:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6621-6622)
07/23/2018-4:50pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2630.
07/23/2018-4:50pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6621-6623)
07/23/2018-4:50pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/29/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 401.
01/29/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-536.
11/30/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
11/30/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/29/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
11/29/2017HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
10/11/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
06/07/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/24/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
05/24/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 05/24/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 05/24/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/25/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources05/24/2017 Referred to
11/30/2017 Markup by
01/29/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-536
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/07/2017 Referred to
10/11/2017 Hearings by
11/29/2017 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/24/2018 Referred to
10/02/2018 Markup by
11/14/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-365

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2630. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/24/2017)

La Paz County Land Conveyance Act

This bill directs the Department of the Interior, after receiving a request from La Paz County, Arizona, to convey to the county, without consideration, 8,000 acres of specified federal land.

The federal land conveyed under this bill: (1) may be used by the county for any public purposes consistent with the Recreation and Public Purposes Act, and (2) shall not be disposed of by the county.

The county shall pay or reimburse Interior, as appropriate, for the reasonable transaction and administrative personnel costs associated with such conveyance.

The bill declares that the United States is released from any liability arising from any hazardous substance existing on the federal land before such conveyance.