There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Promoting Life-Saving New Therapies for Neonates Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote the development of safe drugs for neonates.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/24/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/26/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/24/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/24/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/24/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/07/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/07/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/07/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/13/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/13/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/13/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/13/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/13/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/13/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/13/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 06/13/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/21/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/21/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 06/21/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/21/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/21/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/13/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 07/25/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/25/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/28/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/28/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 09/05/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/05/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/05/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 09/25/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/25/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/27/2017
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/03/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/12/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 10/12/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/24/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/24/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 10/31/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 11/07/2017
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large] 11/07/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/18/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce05/24/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health05/26/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2641.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2641. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/24/2017)

Promoting Life-Saving New Therapies for Neonates Act of 2017

This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to require the Food and Drug Administration (FDA) to award the sponsor of a new drug or biological product for the treatment of newborns a neonatal drug exclusivity voucher upon approval of the medication. A neonatal drug exclusivity voucher is a transferable voucher for a one-year extension of all existing patents and marketing exclusivities for a brand name medication. For a sponsor to be eligible for a voucher, the new medication must: (1) treat a condition identified in the Priority List of Critical Needs for Neonates required under this bill, and (2) have been studied in newborns.

A voucher may be revoked if the new medication is not marketed in the United States within one year of approval.

A voucher may not be used: (1) to extend the marketing exclusivity period for a drug for which the FDA requires an assessment of the safety and effectiveness in newborns, or (2) on the same product as a priority review voucher.

A sponsor intending to use a voucher must notify the FDA at least 15 months before the expiration of the patents or exclusivity to be extended.

The Government Accountability Office must study the effectiveness of this voucher program.