There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Domestic Violence and Stalking Victims Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to protect more victims of domestic violence by preventing their abusers from possessing or receiving firearms, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/11/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/25/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (86)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/25/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/25/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/08/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 06/08/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/13/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/13/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/20/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/29/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/18/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/25/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/27/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/14/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 09/25/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/27/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/02/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 10/02/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/02/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 10/06/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/06/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/10/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/12/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/23/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 10/23/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/23/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/26/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 11/01/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 11/09/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 11/13/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/30/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/07/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 12/19/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/09/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/05/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/05/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/07/2018
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 02/15/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 02/26/2018
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/26/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 03/05/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/14/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 06/01/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/05/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/25/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations07/11/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2670. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/25/2017)

Protecting Domestic Violence and Stalking Victims Act

This bill amends the federal criminal code to modify the prohibition on firearm sale or transfer to or purchase or possession by an individual who is subject to a court order that restrains the individual from harassing, stalking, or threatening an intimate partner or child of an intimate partner. Specifically, the bill revises the elements of a qualifying court order. It also broadens the definition of "intimate partner" to include a dating partner or former dating partner.

Additionally, the bill expands the categories of prohibited persons (i.e., persons barred from receiving or possessing a firearm) to include persons who have been convicted of: (1) a misdemeanor crime of stalking, or (2) a crime involving conduct that would have been stalking if committed within the special maritime and territorial jurisdiction of the United States.