There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

PRIDE Act
Police Reporting Information, Data, and Evidence Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require States to report to the Attorney General certain information regarding use of force incidents involving law enforcement officers and civilians, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/11/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/25/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/07/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/20/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/20/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/23/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/25/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations07/11/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2676. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/25/2017)

Police Reporting Information, Data, and Evidence Act of 2017 or the PRIDE Act

This bill requires a state or Indian tribe that receives funding under the Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant (JAG) program to report on use-of-force incidents involving a law enforcement officer and a civilian.

The Department of Justice (DOJ) may reduce by up to 10% the JAG allocation of a state or Indian tribe that fails to comply.

The bill authorizes DOJ to make grants to law enforcement agencies to comply with reporting requirements, establish reporting systems, promote public awareness, and train law enforcement personnel with respect to use-of-force incidents.