There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Agricultural Worker Program Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To improve agricultural job opportunities, benefits, and security for aliens in the United States and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/11/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/08/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/25/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 05/25/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/06/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 06/06/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/06/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/06/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/06/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/06/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/06/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/07/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 06/08/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 06/12/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/16/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/21/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/21/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/21/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/22/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/26/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 07/11/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/17/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/18/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/18/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/18/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/18/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/18/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/18/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 07/18/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 07/18/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/18/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 07/18/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/24/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/24/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/24/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 08/04/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/12/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/25/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/27/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/05/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/05/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/06/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/06/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/06/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 10/06/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/11/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 10/19/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 10/24/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 11/09/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/15/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary05/25/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security07/11/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/25/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security06/08/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2690. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/25/2017)

Agricultural Worker Program Act of 2017

This bill authorizes the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to confer blue card status upon an alien who: (1) has performed specified periods of U.S. agricultural employment or is a qualifying alien's spouse or child, (2) has been physically present in the United States for a qualifying period, (3) applied for such status during the application period, (4) is not ineligible under specified grounds for such status, (5) has passed security and law enforcement clearances, and (6) has paid the required fees and penalties.

Blue card status is limited to eight years.

A blue card alien (individual) may: (1) work in the United States, and (2) travel from and return to the United States, including commuting to the United States from a foreign residence.

DHS shall adjust an individual's blue card status to lawful permanent resident status if the individual: (1) performs a specified period of qualifying agricultural employment, (2) applies before the expiration of his or her blue card status, and (3) pays a required fine and satisfies any federal tax liability. The bill also provides for status adjustment of such an individual's qualifying spouse and child.

The bill enumerates: (1) grounds for revocation of blue card status or denial of permanent resident status, (2) protections for aliens apprehended before or during the application period or in removal proceedings, and (3) employer protections.

Such an individual: (1) is ineligible for any federal means-tested benefit, and (2) may correct certain social security records.

DHS shall report to Congress, after six months and annually for the next eight years, on the blue card program.