There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Financial Institution Customer Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Financial Institution Customer Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Financial Institution Customer Protection Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide requirements for the appropriate Federal banking agencies when requesting or ordering a depository institution to terminate a specific customer account, to provide for additional requirements related to subpoenas issued under the Financial Institutions Reform, Recovery, and Enforcement Act of 1989, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/11/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 2 (Roll no. 672).(text: CR H9770-9771)
11/16/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-414.
05/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/12/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
12/11/2017-6:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2017-6:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 2 (Roll no. 672). (text: CR H9770-9771)
12/11/2017-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9777-9778)
12/11/2017-5:21pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/11/2017-5:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2706.
12/11/2017-5:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9770-9773)
12/11/2017-5:06pmHouseMr. Luetkemeyer moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/16/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 306.
11/16/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-414.
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 59 - 1.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/11/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
05/25/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
05/25/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (19)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Financial Services05/25/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
11/16/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-414
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs12/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2706. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/11/2017)

Financial Institution Customer Protection Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill specifies that a federal banking agency may not request or order a depository institution to terminate a customer account unless: (1) the agency has a valid reason for doing so, and (2) that reason is not based solely on reputation risk.

Valid reasons for terminating an account include threats to national security and involvement in terrorist financing, including state sponsorship of terrorism.

A federal banking agency requesting a termination must provide the depository institution with notification and justification.