There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Modernizing Government Travel Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Modernizing Government Travel Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Modernizing Government Travel Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Modernizing Government Travel Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Modernizing Government Travel Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for reimbursement for the use of modern travel services by Federal employees traveling on official Government business, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
05/16/2017Became Public Law No: 115-34. (TXT | PDF)
05/16/2017Signed by President.
05/04/2017Presented to President.
05/02/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2683)
04/24/2017Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-31.
01/10/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H279)
01/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
05/16/2017Became Public Law No: 115-34. (TXT | PDF)
05/16/2017Signed by President.
05/04/2017HousePresented to President.
05/03/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/02/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2683)
04/24/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 40.
04/24/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-31.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
03/15/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
01/11/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
01/10/2017-4:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/10/2017-4:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H279)
01/10/2017-4:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 274.
01/10/2017-4:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H279-280)
01/10/2017-4:39pmHouseMr. Chaffetz moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
01/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform01/04/2017 Referred to
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/11/2017 Referred to
03/15/2017 Markup by
04/24/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-31

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.274. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-34 (05/16/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on January 10, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Modernizing Government Travel Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the General Services Administration (GSA) to prescribe regulations to provide for the reimbursement of federal employees traveling on official business for the use of a transportation network company (e.g., Uber or Lyft) or an innovative mobility technology. The Administrative Office of the United States Courts shall prescribe such regulations with respect to judicial branch employees.

An "innovative mobility technology company" is an entity that applies technology to expand and enhance available transportation choices, better manages demand for transportation services, or provides alternatives to driving alone.

A "transportation network company" is an entity that uses a digital network to connect riders to drivers in order for a driver to transport the rider to a point chosen by the rider. This does not include a shared-expense carpool or vanpool arrangement that is not intended to generate profit for the driver.

(Sec. 3) The bill revises the reporting requirements regarding payments pertaining to official travel.

Each agency must annually submit to the GSA data on agency payments for travel and relocation and an analysis of transportation costs.

The GSA shall make the data submitted publicly available upon receipt.

The GSA shall annually submit to the Office of Management and Budget and to specified congressional committees an analysis of the data submitted for specified agencies and a description of any new regulations or changes to existing regulations.