There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

SOS Act of 2017
Save Our Seas Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize and amend the Marine Debris Act to promote international action to reduce marine debris, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/25/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
06/12/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/26/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
05/25/2017Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2017Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2017Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/25/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (47)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Radewagen, Aumua Amata Coleman [R-AS-At Large]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 05/25/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/25/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/08/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 06/08/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/08/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/06/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/06/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/06/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/06/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/25/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/25/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/25/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/25/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 09/25/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/03/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 10/03/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 10/03/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/03/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/12/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/12/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/12/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/02/2017
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 11/02/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/02/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 11/02/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/02/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/28/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/28/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 11/28/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 11/28/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 01/11/2018
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 01/11/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 04/25/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 04/25/2018
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/17/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/13/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/23/2018
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 07/24/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/25/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation05/26/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources05/25/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans06/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2748. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/25/2017)

Save Our Seas Act of 2017 or the SOS Act of 2017

This bill amends the Marine Debris Act to revise the Marine Debris Program to require the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to work with: (1) other agencies to address both land- and sea-based sources of marine debris, and (2) the Department of State and other agencies to promote international action to reduce the incidence of marine debris.

The bill also revises the program by allowing NOAA to make sums available for assisting in the cleanup and response required by severe marine debris events. NOAA must prioritize assistance for activities that respond to a severe marine debris event in: (1) a rural or remote community, or (2) a habitat of national concern.

The bill urges the President to: (1) work with foreign countries that contribute the most to the global marine debris problem in order to find a solution to the problem; (2) study issues related to marine debris, including the economic impacts of marine debris; and (3) encourage the Office of the U.S. Trade Representative to consider the impact of marine debris in relevant future trade agreements.

The Interagency Marine Debris Coordinating Committee must expand to include a senior official from the State Department or from the Department of the Interior.

This bill reauthorizes for FY2018-FY2022: (1) the Marine Debris Program, (2) an information clearinghouse on marine debris, and (3) enforcement of laws about discarded marine debris from ships.