There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Business Opportunities for Veterans Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protecting Business Opportunities for Veterans Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Business Opportunities for Veterans Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the oversight of contracts awarded by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to small business concerns owned and controlled by veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/24/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6175)
07/24/2017Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-243.
05/26/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
07/25/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/24/2017-7:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2017-7:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6175)
07/24/2017-7:16pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6199)
07/24/2017-3:58pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Walz objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
07/24/2017-3:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2749.
07/24/2017-3:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6175-6176)
07/24/2017-3:54pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/24/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 175.
07/24/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-243.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/19/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/19/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/12/2017HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
07/12/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
05/26/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/26/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/26/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 05/26/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 06/28/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/26/2017 Referred to
07/19/2017 Markup by
07/24/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-243
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations05/26/2017 Referred to
07/12/2017 Markup by
07/12/2017 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/25/2017 Referred to

As of 07/20/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2749 - Protecting Business Opportunities for Veterans Act of 2017.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2749. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/24/2017)

Protecting Business Opportunities for Veterans Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill applies certain small business subcontracting limitations to a small business concern owned and controlled by a veteran or a veteran with a service-connected disability.

The Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) may award a contract only after obtaining a certification from the offeror that it will comply with such subcontracting limitations if awarded the contract. Such certification shall: (1) specify the applicable performance requirements, and (2) explicitly acknowledge that the certification is subject to criminal penalties for making false statements in any matter within the jurisdiction of the U.S. government.

The VA Director of Small and Disadvantaged Business Utilization and the VA Chief Acquisition Officer shall jointly refer any violation or suspected violation to the VA Inspector General.

If the VA determines that a contract recipient did not act in good faith, such recipient shall be subject to any or all of the following: (1) referral to the VA Debarment and Suspension Committee, (2) a criminal fine, and (3) criminal prosecution.

The Inspector General shall submit an annual report to Congress for each of 2018-2022 that includes: (1) the number of referred and suspected violations; and (2) the disposition of such violations, including the number of small business concerns suspended or debarred from federal contracting or referred for Department of Justice prosecution.