There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend title 49, United States Code, to ensure reliable air service in American Samoa.

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 49, United States Code, to ensure reliable air service in American Samoa.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
01/31/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H771)
01/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
02/01/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
01/31/2017-2:09pmHouseMr. LoBiondo asked unanimous consent to amend the title to H.R. 276. Agreed to without objection.
01/31/2017-2:09pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
01/31/2017-2:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/31/2017-2:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H771)
01/31/2017-2:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 276.
01/31/2017-2:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H771-772)
01/31/2017-2:01pmHouseMr. LoBiondo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/05/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/04/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
01/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Del. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/09/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/04/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation01/05/2017 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation02/01/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.276. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (01/31/2017)

(Sec. 1) This bill declares that in order to provide and sustain air transportation in American Samoa between the islands of Tutuila and Manu'a, the Department of Transportation may renew a foreign air carrier's emergency air transportation exemption every 180 days (instead of the current 30-day renewal period that applies to other areas).