There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

The Small Business Innovation Research and Small Business Technology Transfer Improvements Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Small Business Innovation Research and Small Business Technology Transfer Improvements Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Business Innovation Research and Small Business Technology Transfer Improvements Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to improve the Small Business Innovation Research program and Small Business Technology Transfer program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
10/11/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7939-7942)
09/14/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-313, Part II.
09/14/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-313, Part I.
05/30/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
10/16/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
10/11/2017-2:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/11/2017-2:44pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7939-7942)
10/11/2017-2:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2763.
10/11/2017-2:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7939-7945)
10/11/2017-2:20pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/14/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 223.
09/14/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 115-313, Part II.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
09/14/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 115-313, Part I.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
06/22/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
06/22/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
06/15/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Small Business
06/15/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Small Business
05/30/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/30/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/30/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
05/30/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7]* 05/30/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 06/20/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business05/30/2017 Referred to
06/15/2017 Markup by
09/14/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-313,Part 1
House Science, Space, and Technology05/30/2017 Referred to
06/22/2017 Markup by
09/14/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-313,Part 1
H. Rept. 115-313,Part 2
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship10/16/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2763. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/30/2017)

Small Business Innovation Research and Small Business Technology Transfer Improvements Act of 2017

This bill amends the Small Business Act to require:

  • the Small Business Administration's (SBA's) annual report on the Small Business Information and Research (SBIR) and Small Business Technology Transfer (STTR) programs to be submitted by December 31, and
  • each federal agency required to establish an SBIR program to submit its annual report on such program by March 30.

The bill requires (current law authorizes) the Department of Defense (DOD), for any contract under the Commercial Readiness Program with a value of at least $100 million, to:

  • establish goals for the transition of Phase III technologies in subcontracting plans, and
  • require a prime contractor to report the number and dollar amount of contacts entered into for Phase III SBIR or STTR projects.

The bill authorizes all agencies participating in the SBIR program, during FY2018-FY2022, to provide SBIR Phase II awards for a project to a small business concern without regard to whether such concern was provided a Phase I award for such project.

The bill changes the temporary pilot program that a covered agency may establish for the allocation of SBIR and STTR program funds for awards for technology development, testing, evaluation, and commercialization assistance for SBIR and STTR phase II technologies, or to support the progress of research, research and development, and commercialization conducted under such programs to phase III, to a permanent Civilian Agency Commercialization Readiness Program.

The bill extends until September 30, 2022, the deadline until which the SBA shall allow each agency required to conduct an SBIR program to use not more than 3% of program funds for administrative, oversight, and contract processing costs.