There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ensuring Veteran Enterprise Participation in Strategic Sourcing Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Ensuring Veteran Enterprise Participation in Strategic Sourcing Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to certify the sufficient participation of small business concerns owned and controlled by veterans and small business concerns owned by veterans with service-connected disabilities in contracts under the Federal Strategic Sourcing Initiative, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/24/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6176-6177)
07/24/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-250.
06/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
07/25/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/24/2017-7:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2017-7:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6176-6177)
07/24/2017-7:17pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6199)
07/24/2017-4:12pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Walz objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
07/24/2017-3:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2781.
07/24/2017-3:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6176-6178)
07/24/2017-3:58pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/24/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 182.
07/24/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-250.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/19/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
07/12/2017HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
07/12/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
06/29/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations
06/06/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/06/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
06/06/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 06/21/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 06/28/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/06/2017 Referred to
07/19/2017 Markup by
07/24/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-250
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations06/06/2017 Referred to
06/29/2017 Hearings by
07/12/2017 Markup by
07/12/2017 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/25/2017 Referred to

As of 07/20/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.2781 - Ensuring Veteran Enterprise Participation in Strategic Sourcing Act.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2781. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/24/2017)

Ensuring Veteran Enterprise Participation in Strategic Sourcing Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to certify that sufficient numbers of small businesses owned and controlled by veterans, and of small business owned by veterans with service-connected disabilities, are represented within each category of supplies or services (except for domestic delivery services) for which a suite of contracts has been awarded under the Federal Strategic Sourcing Initiative. A "sufficient number" means between two and enough to maximize the percentage of orders entered into by the VA with such businesses, as determined by the VA.

If such representation within a category is not sufficient, the VA shall: (1) consult with the General Services Administration to increase the number of such concerns awarded contracts under that category, or (2) stop awarding orders under that category of the initiative.