There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

HEAL for Immigrant Women and Families Act of 2017
Health Equity and Access under the Law for Immigrant Women and Families Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expand access to health care services, including sexual, reproductive, and maternal health services, for immigrant women, men, and families by removing legal barriers to health insurance coverage, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/06/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
06/09/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/06/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/06/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/08/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 06/08/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/15/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/15/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/15/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/15/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/15/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/22/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 08/11/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/07/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/07/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 09/27/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 11/07/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/06/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/09/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/06/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2788.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2788. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/06/2017)

Health Equity and Access under the Law for Immigrant Women and Families Act of 2017 or the HEAL Immigrant Women and Families Act of 2017

This bill amends titles XIX (Medicaid) and XXI (Children's Health Insurance) (CHIP) of the Social Security Act to extend Medicaid and CHIP coverage to aliens lawfully present in the United States who otherwise meet eligibility requirements. This applies to individuals granted deferred action or other federally authorized presence but not to nonimmigrants (e.g., individuals with a temporary worker visa).

Individuals granted federally authorized presence, except nonimmigrants, are eligible for health insurance exchanges and reduced cost sharing under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and premium subsidies under the Internal Revenue Code.