There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (17)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DHS Authorization Act
Department of Homeland Security Authorization Act

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Coast Guard Authorization Act of 2017
  • Department of Homeland Security Authorization Act for Fiscal Years 2018 and 2019
  • FEMA Reauthorization Act of 2017
  • Immigration and Customs Enforcement Authorization Act of 2017
  • Secret Service Reauthorization Act of 2017
  • United States Citizenship and Immigration Services Authorization Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

DHS Authorization Act of 2017
Department of Homeland Security Authorization Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

DHS Authorization Act of 2017
Department of Homeland Security Authorization Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

DHS Authorization Act
Department of Homeland Security Authorization Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate for portions of this bill
  • Congressional Commission to Review the Congressional Oversight of the Department of Homeland Security Act of 2018
  • FEMA Reauthorization Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to make certain improvements in the laws administered by the Secretary of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
04/16/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
07/20/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 41 (Roll no. 403).(text: CR H6047-6109)
06/28/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-198.
06/08/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
04/16/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 381.
04/16/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
03/07/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
02/07/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Hearings held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
07/20/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
07/20/2017-11:34amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/20/2017-11:34amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 41 (Roll no. 403). (text: CR H6047-6109)
07/20/2017-11:01amHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6128)
07/20/2017-9:56amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/20/2017-9:16amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2825.
07/20/2017-9:16amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6047-6120)
07/20/2017-9:15amHouseMr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/28/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 135.
06/28/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-198.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/14/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/14/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
06/08/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
06/08/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/08/2017 Referred to
06/14/2017 Markup by
06/28/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-198
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/20/2017 Referred to
02/07/2018 Hearings by
03/07/2018 Markup by
04/16/2018 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/15/2018 Legislative interest

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (80)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2825. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/2017)

Department of Homeland Security Authorization Act of 2017 or the DHS Authorization Act of 2017

This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish in the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) a Headquarters, which shall, among other things: (1) establish an overall strategy to successfully further the mission of DHS, and (2) ensure that DHS successfully meets operational and management performance objectives.

The bill: (1) sets forth the responsibilities of Chief Privacy Officer, the Chief Financial Officer, and the Chief Information Officer of DHS; (2) establishes the positions of Chief Procurement Officer and Chief Security Officer; and (3) includes acquisition management with the responsibilities of the Under Secretary for Management.

DHS must establish an Acquisition Review Board to: (1) strengthen accountability and uniformity within the DHS acquisition review process, (2) review major acquisition programs, and (3) review the use of best practices.

DHS must adopt, and report on, a multiyear acquisition strategy.