Committees: H.R.2825 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security06/08/2017 Referred to
06/14/2017 Markup by
06/28/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-198
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/20/2017 Referred to
02/07/2018 Hearings by
03/07/2018 Markup by
04/16/2018 Reported by
House Transportation and Infrastructure05/15/2018 Legislative interest