There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Voices for Veterans Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to extend and expand the membership of the Advisory Committee on Minority Veterans to include veterans who are lesbian, gay, bisexual, or transgender.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/08/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/08/2017Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/08/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/12/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 06/12/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/12/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/12/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/13/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/29/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 09/25/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/27/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/27/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/08/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/23/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/23/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 07/23/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs06/08/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2827.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2827. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/2017)

Voices for Veterans Act

This bill: (1) expands the membership of the Advisory Committee on Minority Veterans to include veterans who are lesbian, gay, bisexual, or transgender, and (2) extend the Commission through December 31, 2019.