There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Acupuncture for Heroes and Seniors Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to ensure access to qualified acupuncturist services for military members and military dependents, to amend title 38, United States Code, to ensure access to acupuncturist services through the Department of Veterans Affairs, to amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide for coverage of qualified acupuncturist services under the Medicare program; to amend the Public Health Service Act to authorize the appointment of qualified acupuncturists as officers in the commissioned Regular Corps and the Ready Reserve Corps of the Public Health Service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/08/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
07/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/20/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/09/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/08/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 06/28/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/28/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/12/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 01/19/2018

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/08/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/09/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services06/08/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel07/17/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs06/08/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/08/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/08/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health06/20/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2839. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/2017)

Acupuncture for Heroes and Seniors Act of 2017

This bill provides access to qualified acupuncturist services for: (1) military members and their dependents under the TRICARE program, and (2) veterans enrolled in the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) health care system.

The position of certified, trained acupuncturist for civilian employees in the Department of Defense shall be the grade of GS-12 or higher under the General Schedule.

The VA shall carry out such program at in at least one VA facility in each Veterans Integrated Service Network in both urban and rural areas.

The VA shall establish the Advisory Committee on Acupuncturist Services.

Title XVIII of the Social Security Act is amended to provide Medicare coverage for acupuncturist services.

The Public Health Act is amended to make acupuncturists eligible for appointment as officers in the commissioned Regular Corps and the Ready Reserve Corps of the Public Health Service.