There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Automatic Voter Registration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Voter Registration Act of 1993 to require each State to ensure that each individual who provides identifying information to the State motor vehicle authority is automatically registered to vote in elections for Federal office held in the State unless the individual does not meet the eligibility requirements for registering to vote in such elections or declines to be registered to vote in such elections, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/08/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
06/08/2017Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (148)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/08/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/08/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/08/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/08/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 06/08/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/12/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/12/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/12/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/12/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 06/12/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 06/12/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/15/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/15/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/15/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 06/15/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 06/15/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/20/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/21/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/21/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/22/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/22/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/12/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/12/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 07/12/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/18/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/18/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/28/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/28/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/28/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/28/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/28/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 08/01/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 08/04/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5] 08/15/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 08/22/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 08/25/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 08/25/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/05/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/05/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 09/05/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 09/05/2017
Del. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/08/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 09/14/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/14/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/14/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 09/27/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 09/27/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 09/27/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 10/12/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/26/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/15/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 02/15/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 04/25/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/15/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/14/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/14/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/06/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/18/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/25/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/25/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/25/2018
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/25/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Committee on House Administration06/08/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2840.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2840. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/2017)

Automatic Voter Registration Act

This bill amends the National Voter Registration Act of 1993 to require state motor vehicle authorities, upon receiving certain identifying information with respect to an individual requesting motor vehicle authority services, to transmit the information to the state election official. The state election official shall then notify the individual that unless the individual declines to be registered to vote in federal elections in the state, the individual shall be automatically registered unless the individual does not meet voter registration eligibility requirements or is already registered to vote.

A state may not use any identifying information regarding an individual's citizenship status for any purpose other than determining whether the individual is eligible to vote in federal elections.