There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Disarm Hate Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prevent a person who has been convicted of a misdemeanor hate crime, or received an enhanced sentence for a misdemeanor because of hate or bias in its commission, from obtaining a firearm.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/08/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/19/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/08/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/08/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/12/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/12/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 06/12/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/11/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/11/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 07/11/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/11/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/11/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/11/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/13/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 10/11/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/11/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 10/11/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/11/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/09/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 11/09/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 11/09/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/09/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/09/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/27/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/27/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/15/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/02/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/12/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/21/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 07/17/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/17/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/17/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/08/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations07/19/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2841. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/08/2017)

Disarm Hate Act

This bill amends the federal criminal code to prohibit firearm sale or transfer to and receipt or possession by an individual who has: (1) been convicted in any court of a misdemeanor hate crime, or (2) received from any court an enhanced hate crime misdemeanor sentence.

The term "convicted in any court of a misdemeanor hate crime" means a conviction for a misdemeanor offense that has, as an element, that the conduct was motivated by hate or bias because of the actual or perceived race, color, religion, national origin, gender, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability of any person.

The term "received from any court an enhanced hate crime misdemeanor sentence" means the imposition of an enhanced sentence for a misdemeanor that involves violence and is based, in whole or in part, on conduct motivated by hate or bias because of the actual or perceived race, color, religion, national origin, gender, sexual orientation, gender identity, or disability of any person.