There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Supporting Families in Substance Abuse Treatment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Supporting Families in Substance Abuse Treatment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To support foster care maintenance payments for children with parents in a licensed residential family-based treatment facility for substance abuse.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
06/20/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4968-4969)
06/08/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/21/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
06/20/2017-5:49pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/20/2017-5:49pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4968-4969)
06/20/2017-5:32pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4968-4970)
06/20/2017-5:32pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2857.
06/20/2017-5:32pmHouseMrs. Noem moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/12/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/08/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
06/08/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/08/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/13/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/08/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources06/12/2017 Referred to
Senate Finance06/21/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2857.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2857. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/20/2017)

Supporting Families in Substance Abuse Treatment Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends part E (Foster Care and Adoption Assistance) of title IV of the Social Security Act to provide that the removal and foster care placement of a child shall meet the requirements for foster care maintenance payments on the child's behalf if the child has been placed with a parent residing in a licensed residential family-based treatment facility.

Placement with such a parent shall meet these requirements only if:

  • the placement recommendation is specified in the child's case plan before the placement;
  • the treatment facility offers, as part of substance abuse treatment, parenting skills training, parent education, and individual and family counseling; and
  • this training and counseling are delivered under an organizational structure and treatment framework that involves understanding, recognizing, and responding to the effects of all types of trauma, and in accordance with recognized principles of a trauma-informed approach and trauma-specific interventions, to address the consequences of trauma and facilitate healing.

The bill specifies the amount the state may receive for a child placed with a parent who is in a licensed residential family-based treatment facility for substance abuse.