There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Preserving Patient Access to Compounded Medications Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to compounding pharmacies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/16/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/12/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 06/12/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/15/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/15/2017
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 06/21/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/21/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/21/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/22/2017
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/22/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 06/27/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/29/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/12/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 07/13/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/18/2017
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/19/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 07/20/2017
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 07/20/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 07/24/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/24/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 07/27/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/05/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/05/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 09/05/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 09/05/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 09/05/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/05/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/05/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/12/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/12/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/12/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/25/2017
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 09/26/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/27/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/27/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 10/10/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/10/2017
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 10/10/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/10/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 10/10/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 10/10/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 10/12/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/22/2017
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2] 01/09/2018
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/18/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 02/26/2018
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/12/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/24/2018
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6] 04/27/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 05/07/2018
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/16/2018
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/21/2018
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/23/2018
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 05/25/2018
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 06/01/2018
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 06/06/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 06/27/2018
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/11/2018
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/12/2018
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 07/12/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 07/13/2018
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 07/16/2018
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/23/2018
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/26/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/12/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health06/16/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2871.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2871. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/12/2017)

Preserving Patient Access to Compounded Medications Act of 2017

This bill amends the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to expand the circumstances under which a drug may be compounded (manufactured at small scale) to allow pharmacists and physicians to compound drugs for administration to patients in an office or clinical setting, in accordance with state law. (Drugs that are compounded do not need to meet certain federal requirements regarding manufacturing, labeling, or approval.)

Dietary supplements may be used in the compounding of a drug.

The bill exempts from interstate distribution limits the dispensing of a compounded drug from the facility where it is compounded to a patient or health facility.

The scope of Food and Drug Administration (FDA) inspections of compounding pharmacies is limited to pertinent equipment, materials, containers, and labeling, which is the same scope as inspections of pharmacies. (Currently, the scope of inspections of compounding pharmacies is the same scope as inspections of drug manufacturers.)

The bill eliminates the requirement for compounding pharmacies to register with the FDA as drug manufacturers.