There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Automatic Voter Registration Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require States to automatically register eligible voters to vote in elections for Federal office, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/22/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
06/12/2017Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2017Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2017Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/12/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/12/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/13/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/13/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/13/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/13/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/13/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/13/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/13/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 07/13/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/13/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/13/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/13/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/13/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/13/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/13/2017
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/13/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/13/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/13/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 07/13/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 07/13/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/13/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/13/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/13/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/13/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 07/13/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/13/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/13/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 07/13/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 07/13/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/13/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 07/13/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/13/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/13/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/13/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/13/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 07/13/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/26/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/26/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 07/26/2017
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/26/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/26/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 07/26/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/26/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 07/26/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/26/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 07/26/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 07/26/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/26/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/26/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/26/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/26/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/11/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/11/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/11/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/11/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/11/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 05/23/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/23/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 07/31/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/12/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 10/12/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration06/12/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology06/12/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Research and Technology05/22/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.