There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

FLIGHT Act of 2017
Forward Looking Investment in General Aviation, Hangars, and Tarmacs Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reform apportionments to general aviation airports under the airport improvement program, to improve project delivery at certain airports, and to designate certain airports as disaster relief airports, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
06/13/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/12/2017Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2017Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2017Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 06/12/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/21/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/22/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/23/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/23/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/26/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/12/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation06/13/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2879. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/12/2017)

Forward Looking Investment in General Aviation, Hangars, and Tarmacs Act of 2017 or the FLIGHT Act of 2017

This bill revises general aviation apportionments by: (1) providing at least 4% of entitlement funding to airports designated as disaster relief airports, (2) increasing the period of availability of apportioned funds, (3) increasing the federal government's share of project costs for certain airports to 95%, and (4) allowing the use of non apportioned funds for general aviation airport grants.

DOT shall: (1) implement an expedited and coordinated environmental review process for general aviation airport construction or improvement projects; and (2) establish a public-private partnership program for building or improving hangars, businesses, or other facilities at general aviation airports and privately owned airports for public use that do not have scheduled air service.

The bill requires DOT to designate certain airports as disaster relief airports, including regional reliever airports, airports within a reasonable distance of a hospital or transplant or trauma center, or airports in a region prone to natural disasters.

The bill treats the construction of certain aircraft used exclusively for recreational purposes as an "aeronautical activity" for purposes of airport improvement grants.