There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Volunteer Income Tax Assistance Permanence Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make permanent the Volunteer Income Tax Assistance matching grant program.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
04/17/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3373-3374)
06/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
04/18/2018-6:20pmPursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 2901 is laid on the table.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2018-4:15pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2018-4:15pmOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3373-3374)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2018-4:01pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2901.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2018-4:01pmConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3373-3375)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/2018-4:01pmMr. Curbelo (FL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
04/11/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/15/2017Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 06/21/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/21/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/21/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/21/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/21/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/22/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 06/27/2017
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 06/27/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 06/27/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/28/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/28/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/28/2017
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 06/29/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/29/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/29/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 07/11/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 07/11/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 07/12/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/18/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/24/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/24/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/24/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/25/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/28/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/28/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/28/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 07/28/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 08/04/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 08/04/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 08/04/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/01/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/06/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/07/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/03/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 10/04/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 10/11/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/25/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 03/08/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means06/15/2017 Referred to
04/11/2018 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2901. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/15/2017)

Volunteer Income Tax Assistance Permanence Act of 2017

This bill directs the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) to establish a Community Volunteer Income Tax Assistance Matching Grant Program to provide matching funds for the development, expansion, or continuation of tax preparation programs to assist low-income taxpayers and members of underserved populations.

Unless otherwise provided by a specific appropriation, the IRS may not allocate more than $30 million per fiscal year (exclusive of costs of administering the program) for the program.