There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Climate Change National Security Strategy Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct Federal departments and agencies to perform certain functions to ensure that climate change-related impacts are fully considered in the development of national security doctrine, policies, and plans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
05/22/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
07/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/16/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/15/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Science, Space, and Technology, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (70)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 06/15/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 06/15/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 06/15/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/16/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/20/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 06/20/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/20/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/20/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/20/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/20/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/20/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 06/20/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 06/20/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/21/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/21/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/21/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/21/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/21/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/22/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 06/22/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/22/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/27/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 06/27/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 06/27/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/27/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/06/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/06/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/13/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 07/13/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/17/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/18/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/18/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/19/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/24/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/27/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 10/02/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 10/02/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 10/02/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 10/02/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 10/04/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/16/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/16/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/24/2018

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce06/15/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment06/16/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services06/15/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness07/17/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs06/15/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology06/15/2017 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment05/22/2018 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)06/15/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2908.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2908. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/15/2017)

Climate Change National Security Strategy Act of 2017

This bill requires the National Security Advisor and the Director of the Office of Science and Technology Policy to jointly establish an interagency Climate and National Security Working Group, which must develop an action plan on current and projected climate-related impacts on national security interests.

Specified federal departments and agencies must each develop a plan that ensures that such impacts are identified and considered in the development and implementation of relevant national security doctrine, policies, and plans. The plans must be updated at least annually.