There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Museum of the American Latino Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish within the Smithsonian Institution the National Museum of the American Latino, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
06/23/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/16/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/15/2017Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2017Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2017Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2017Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/15/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23]* 06/15/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4]* 06/15/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/20/2017
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 06/20/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 06/20/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 06/20/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 06/20/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/20/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/20/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 06/20/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 07/11/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/11/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 07/11/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 07/27/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/27/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/27/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/27/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 07/27/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 08/18/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 08/18/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/13/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 02/20/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/20/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 02/20/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 02/20/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 02/20/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/20/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/20/2018
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/09/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 03/09/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 03/09/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 03/09/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 06/21/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 06/21/2018
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/21/2018
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 07/17/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 08/07/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 08/07/2018
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/07/2018
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/13/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/28/2018
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 09/28/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/02/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/05/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/26/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration06/15/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources06/15/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/23/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/15/2017 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management06/16/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2911. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/15/2017)

National Museum of the American Latino Act

This bill establishes the National Museum of the American Latino in the Smithsonian Institution.

The purposes of the museum are to: (1) illuminate Latino contributions to the story of the United States; (2) provide for the collection, study, research, publication, and establishment of exhibitions and programs related to Latino life, art, history, and culture; and (3) provide for collaboration with Smithsonian Institution museums and research centers and other museums and educational institutions in the United States and abroad to promote the study and appreciation of Latino life, art, history, culture, and its impact on society in the United States.

The bill establishes a Board of Trustees for the museum to advise and assist the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian on all matters related to the administration and preservation of the museum.

The Director of the museum shall manage the museum and may carry out educational and liaison programs in support of its goals.

The Board of Regents shall designate a site for the museum and is authorized to design and construct it.