There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Outdoor Recreation Legacy Partnership Grant Program Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide grants for projects to acquire land and water for parks and other outdoor recreation purposes and to develop new or renovate existing outdoor recreation facilities.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/20/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/27/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/20/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 06/20/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/20/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/20/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 06/20/2017
Del. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 06/20/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/21/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/23/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/23/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/23/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 07/11/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/11/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/18/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 07/18/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/18/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/05/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/05/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 10/25/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 10/25/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 11/28/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/13/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/08/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/11/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/02/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 10/02/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources06/20/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands06/27/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2943. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/20/2017)

Outdoor Recreation Legacy Partnership Grant Program Act

This bill directs the Department of the Interior to establish an outdoor recreation legacy partnership grant program under which Interior may award grants to eligible entities (the states, their political subdivisions, special purpose districts, and Indian Tribes) for projects to: (1) acquire land and water for parks and other outdoor recreation purposes, and (2) develop new or renovate existing outdoor recreation facilities.

As a condition for receiving a grant, an eligible entity shall provide matching funds in cash or in kind equal to 100% of the amounts available under the grant.

A grant recipient may use the grant to acquire land or water providing outdoor recreation opportunities to the public.

A grant may also be used to develop or renovate outdoor recreational facilities, with priority given to projects that:

  • create or significantly enhance access to park and recreational opportunities in an urban neighborhood or community;
  • engage and empower underserved communities and youth;
  • provide opportunities for youth employment or job training;
  • establish or expand public-private partnerships;
  • take advantage of coordination among various levels of government.

Grant funds may not be used for specified costs, facilities, and activities, including the acquisition of lands or interests that restrict access to particular persons.