There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

To Offer Refugees College Help (TORCH) Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to provide for in-State tuition rates for refugees and asylees.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/20/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
06/20/2017Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (63)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 06/20/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 06/20/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20]* 06/20/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/20/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 06/22/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/22/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/22/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 06/26/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/28/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 07/12/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/20/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 07/10/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/26/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce06/20/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2944.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.