There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the S.A.F.E. Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008 to provide a temporary license for loan originators transitioning between employers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
02/13/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-552.
06/20/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
02/13/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 414.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/13/2018Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-552.
12/13/2017Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 60 - 0.
12/13/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
12/12/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/20/2017Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/20/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 06/20/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 06/29/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 06/29/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/29/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/29/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 06/29/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/29/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/29/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 07/14/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/14/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 07/14/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/14/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/14/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/28/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/28/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/28/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/05/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 09/05/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/05/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/05/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/05/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/27/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 09/27/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 09/27/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/27/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 09/27/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/24/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/24/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 10/24/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 10/24/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 10/24/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 10/24/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/24/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 10/24/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 10/24/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/03/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 11/03/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/04/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 12/04/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 12/04/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/11/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/19/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/19/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/07/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/20/2017 Referred to
12/13/2017 Markup by
02/13/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-552

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.2948. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House without amendment (02/13/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the S.A.F.E. Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008 to temporarily allow loan originators that meet specified requirements to continue to originate loans after moving: (1) from one state to another, or (2) from a depository institution to a non-depository institution.

(Sec. 2) The bill revises the Act's civil liability immunity provisions.