There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Home Mortgage Disclosure Adjustment Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Home Mortgage Disclosure Adjustment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Home Mortgage Disclosure Adjustment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Home Mortgage Disclosure Act of 1975 to specify which depository institutions are subject to the maintenance of records and disclosure requirements of such Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
01/18/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 184 (Roll no. 32).
01/08/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-485.
06/20/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
01/19/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
01/18/2018-7:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/18/2018-7:31pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 243 - 184 (Roll no. 32).
01/18/2018-7:24pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 191 - 236 (Roll no. 31).
01/18/2018-7:01pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H536-537)
01/18/2018-4:40pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the motion to recommit, the Chair put the question on the motion, and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Ellison demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
01/18/2018-4:40pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
01/18/2018-4:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with instructions to add language mandating certain officers and institutions to confirm that they abide by requirements outlined within the amendment.
01/18/2018-4:32pmHouseMr. Ellison moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (text: CR H520-521)
01/18/2018-4:32pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
01/18/2018-3:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 2954.
01/18/2018-3:25pmHouseThe rule provides for one hour of general debate on both measures. Only those amendments printed in Part A of the report shall be considered for H.R. 3326. The amendment printed in Part B of the report, relating to H.R. 2954, shall be considered as adopted. The rule allows for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both measures.
01/18/2018-3:25pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 693. (consideration: CR H513-521)
01/17/2018-1:46pmHouseRule H. Res. 693 passed House.
01/16/2018-7:21pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 693 Reported to House. The rule provides for one hour of general debate on both measures. Only those amendments printed in Part A of the report shall be considered for H.R. 3326. The amendment printed in Part B of the report, relating to H.R. 2954, shall be considered as adopted. The rule allows for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both measures.
01/08/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 359.
01/08/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-485.
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 24.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/11/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
06/20/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
06/20/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/20/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
01/08/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-485
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs01/19/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.2954. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (01/18/2018)

Home Mortgage Disclosure Adjustment Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Home Mortgage Disclosure Act of 1975 to exempt a depository institution from certain records and disclosure requirements related to the itemization of loan data: (1) with respect to closed-end mortgage loans, if the depository institution originated fewer than 500 such loans in each of the two preceding years; and (2) with respect to open-end lines of credit, if the depository institution originated fewer than 500 such lines of credit in each of the two preceding years.

(Sec. 3) The amount deposited in the Securities and Exchange Commission Reserve Fund for FY2018 may not exceed $48 million.